Global patent index - EP 1072434 A1

EP 1072434 A1 2001-01-31 - Blanket for a printing machine cylinder with narrow gap

Title (en)

Blanket for a printing machine cylinder with narrow gap

Title (de)

Gummituch für Druckmaschinenzylinder mit schmaler Rille

Title (fr)

Blanchet pour un cylindre a gorge etroite d'une machine a imprimer

Publication

EP 1072434 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400181 A

Priority

FR 9900828 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2788720A1] The blanket is made to given thickness (E). It includes uniform structures, a lithographic- or printing layer (10) based on elastomers, a compressible layer and a reinforcing layer. Pressure of 10-30 MPa and heat at 100-250 deg C are applied to the free edges (1a, 1b) compressing thickness by 25% or more, whilst maintaining surface integrity. An Independent claim is included for a corresponding two-part hot-pressing mold used during edge reduction and reinforcement. Preferred features: Edge pressure is applied, over 5-15% of total area. Edge rigidity is increased and with it, the modulus of flexural rigidity. A material, rigid or becoming so, is placed on the edges, e.g. a strip of metal, thermoplastic or thermoset, to be integrated by hot pressing. Mineral or organic additives, filaments or fibers are added to the resin to improve blanket mechanical properties. Edges can be bent back through various acute or obtuse angles with respect to the printing surface. Pressure is maintained during cooling, for permanent set of thickness reduction.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un blanchet d'impression comportant au moins un bord d'extrémité libre relativement mince et comprenant au moins une couche lithographique ou d'impression à base d'élastomères, une couche compressible et une couche de renfort. Selon l'invention, ladite couche de renfort (12) à base de fils ou de fibres présente un facteur de couverture compris entre 75 et 96 % et un volume libre supérieur à 55 %, ledit blanchet (1) présentant une épaisseur réduite d'au moins 25 % par rapport au reste du blanchet, sur une surface s'étendant sur au moins un bord d'extrémité libre (1a, 1b) du blanchet et comprise entre 5 et 15 % de la surface totale du blanchet. L'invention s'applique au domaine de l'imprimerie offset. <IMAGE> <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41N 10/06; B41F 30/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41N 10/06 (2006.01); B41N 10/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41N 10/06 (2013.01); B41N 10/02 (2013.01); B41N 2210/02 (2013.01); B41N 2210/04 (2013.01); B41N 2210/06 (2013.01); B41N 2210/10 (2013.01); B41N 2210/14 (2013.01); Y10S 428/909 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2419 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24198 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24207 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24215 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24223 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24231 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2424 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24248 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24256 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24264 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24777 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24785 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24793 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2481 (2013.01); Y10T 442/20 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2788720 A1 20000728; FR 2788720 B1 20010406; EP 1072434 A1 20010131; US 6645601 B1 20031111

INPADOC legal status

2008-02-27 [18RA] DATE OF RECEIPT OF REQUEST FOR RE-ESTABLISHMENT OF RIGHTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18RA

- Effective date: 20080117

2007-07-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20070123

2006-08-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20060710

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE CH DE GB IT LI SE

2001-10-17 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 20010607

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010607

2001-07-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MACDERMID GRAPHIC ARTS S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE GB IT LI SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI