Global Patent Index - EP 1072437 A2

EP 1072437 A2 2001-01-31 - Book clamping device

Title (en)

Book clamping device

Title (de)

Buchklemmvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de préhension des livres

Publication

EP 1072437 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00113044 A

Priority

US 35225099 A

Abstract (en)

The book clamping device is part of a bookbinding machine. It has a first clamping element (10) and a second clamping element (12) fitted to the first one. A first flexible spring plate (18) is connected to the second clamping element. At least one of the clamping elements includes a pressing plate (16). The first flexible spring plate is fixed to the pressing element of the second clamping element.

Abstract (de)

Eine Buchklemmvorrichtung für eine Buchbindemaschine mit einem ersten Klemmelement (10) und einem an das erste Klemmelement (10) angepassten zweiten Klemmelement (12), zeichnet sich dadurch aus, dass mit dem zweiten Klemmelement (12) eine erste flexible Federplatte (18, 34, 36) verbunden ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42C 19/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42C 13/00 (2006.01); B42C 19/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42C 19/08 (2013.01); Y10T 24/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072437 A2 20010131; EP 1072437 A3 20010919; EP 1072437 B1 20031119; DE 10030877 A1 20010315; DE 50004477 D1 20031224; JP 2001047764 A 20010220; JP 4582603 B2 20101117; US 6736581 B1 20040518

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130630

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130630

2014-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120623

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120702

2013-04-18 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50004477

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-03-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120623

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120625

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120101

2012-01-11 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120101

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110629

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110628

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110629

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-10-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100624

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070623

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2005-04-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: HEIDELBERG WEB SYSTEMS, INC.

2005-03-04 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2005-03-04 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-11-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040820

2004-11-03 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-08-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040113

2003-12-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50004477 P 20031224

2003-11-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2003-11-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010821

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI