Global Patent Index - EP 1072439 A2

EP 1072439 A2 2001-01-31 - Folder

Title (en)

Folder

Title (de)

Ordner

Title (fr)

Classeur

Publication

EP 1072439 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00400128 A

Priority

  • JP 20694399 A
  • JP 25236899 A

Abstract (en)

It is an object of the present invention to provide a document folder which ensures that a document can easily be inserted into and taken out of a document holding portion thereof. The present invention provides a document folder 1 for holding a document 10 or the like, which comprises: a document holding portion 4 having a rectangular plan shape and defined by a pair of sheet portions 2, 3 of a synthetic resin material which are separate from each other along one of opposite side edges of the document folder and continuous with each other along the other side edge of the document folder; reinforcement portions 6, 7 of a plural-layer structure respectively provided in separate one-edge portions of the sheet portions along the one side edge of the document folder, and each reinforced by a multiplicity of fusion-bonded spots 5 formed therein; and binder engagement means including a plurality of engagement portions 8 formed in a properly spaced relation in the respective reinforcement portions along the one side edge of the document folder for engagement with binding hooks of a document binder. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42F 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42F 3/00 (2006.01); B42F 7/02 (2006.01); B42F 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42F 3/003 (2013.01); B42F 7/025 (2013.01); B42F 11/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072439 A2 20010131; EP 1072439 A3 20011017

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-03 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20040102

2002-07-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2002-04-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020128

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI