Global Patent Index - EP 1072441 A2

EP 1072441 A2 2001-01-31 - Blackboard made of metal

Title (en)

Blackboard made of metal

Title (de)

Wandtafel aus Metall

Title (fr)

Tableau noir en métal

Publication

EP 1072441 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00113722 A

Priority

DE 29913005 U

Abstract (en)

Metal dry wipe board with a wipeable coating comprises a section (10) of a coated sheet with bracing ribs (11-13) molded in two opposite edges. Preferred Features: The bracing ribs run parallel to the longer edges of the board.

Abstract (de)

Eine Wandtafel besteht aus einem Zuschnitt 10 aus mit einer beschreibbaren Schicht versehenem Blech und weist in zwei gegenüberliegenden Randbereichen im Querschnitt trapezförmige Versteifungsrippen 11, 12 auf. Eine der Versteifungsrippen 12 ist mit Schlitzen 18 zum Einhängen einer Ablage versehen, die im Lieferzustand ebenfalls aus einem im wesentlichen ebenen Zuschnitt 20 besteht. Der Zuschnitt 20 ist mit zwei linienförmigen Schwächungszonen 22, 23 versehen, längs denen er sich vom Benutzer zur Ausbildung einer Ablageschale biegen läßt. Die so gebildete Wandtafel mit Ablage ist nicht nur in der Herstellung unaufwendig, sondern hat auch im verpackten Versandzustand minimalen Platzbedarf. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B43L 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 97/00 (2006.01); B43L 1/04 (2006.01); B43L 1/06 (2006.01); G09F 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B43L 1/06 (2013.01); A47B 97/001 (2013.01); G09F 7/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 6927403 U 19691204 - GROB GUSTAV [CH]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29913005 U1 20001207; EP 1072441 A2 20010131; EP 1072441 A3 20020424; JP 2001063286 A 20010313

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021025

2003-02-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-01-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI