Global Patent Index - EP 1072492 A1

EP 1072492 A1 2001-01-31 - Device and method for transferring of bulk material into a consumer

Title (en)

Device and method for transferring of bulk material into a consumer

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Einbringen von Schüttgut in einen Verbraucher

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour transférer d'un produit en vrac dans un consommateur

Publication

EP 1072492 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00115872 A

Priority

DE 19935726 A

Abstract (en)

A transfer container(36) is installed between the supply container(20) and the filling nozzle(48). At least one drain seal(26) is located between the containers and pneumatically separates their chambers and through which the supply container is connected to the transfer container. The transfer container is connected to a pressure line(42) and in the closed position of the drain seal is provided with a higher pressure than ambient. The filling nozzle is connected to the transfer container by a feed hose(46). An Independent claim is included for a procedure for introducing a loose product from a supply container to a piece of user equipment entailing setting the internal pressure of the supply container to ambient pressure, and charging the transfer container to a higher pressure.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Vorrichtung zum Einbringen von Schüttgut -- insbesondere von Bremssand -- aus einem Vorratsbehälter (20) durch einen Förderschlauch (46) mit Füllspitze (48) in einen Verbraucher (52), ist zwischen dem Vorratsbehälter (20) und der Füllspitze (48) zumindest ein Schleusbehälter (36) angeordnet und zwischen beiden Behältern wenigstens ein ihre Innenräume (21,37) pneumatisch trennender Auslaufverschluss (26) vorgesehen, über den der Vorratsbehälter (20) mit dem Schleusbehälter (36) verbindbar ist; letzter ist mit einer Druckluftleitung (42) verbunden sowie in Schließstellung des Auslaufverschlusses (26) mit einem zum Umgebungsdruck höheren Druck versehen. Die Füllspitze (48) wird durch den Förderschlauch (46) mit dem Schleusbehälter (36) verbunden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61K 11/00; B67D 5/02; B67D 5/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61K 11/00 (2006.01); B65G 53/12 (2006.01); B65G 53/16 (2006.01); B67D 7/02 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61K 11/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072492 A1 20010131; EP 1072492 B1 20040414; AT 264212 T 20040415; CZ 20002740 A3 20010314; CZ 297609 B6 20070214; DE 19935726 A1 20010201; PL 195402 B1 20070928; PL 341727 A1 20010212

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170731

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170726

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170725

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170728

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110724

2012-04-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 264212 T

- Effective date: 20110724

2010-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100720

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-04-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050117

2005-01-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040809

2004-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50006044 P 20040519

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2004-04-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB IT

2001-09-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI