Global Patent Index - EP 1072514 A1

EP 1072514 A1 2001-01-31 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR WRAPPING PRODUCTS, PARTICULARLY STACKS OF PRODUCTS, WITH A SLEEVE OF STRETCH FOIL

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR WRAPPING PRODUCTS, PARTICULARLY STACKS OF PRODUCTS, WITH A SLEEVE OF STRETCH FOIL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM UMHÜLLEN VON STÜCKGUT,INSBESONDERE STÜCKGUTSTAPELN, MIT EINER STRETCHFOLIENHAUBE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR ENVELOPPER DES MARCHANDISES, EN PARTICULIER DES PILES DE MARCHANDISES, AVEC UNE HOUSSE DE FILM ETIRABLE

Publication

EP 1072514 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00115733 A

Priority

DE 19933856 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves forming a hood from a tube from a tube storage device with a circumference at least 10 per cent less than that of the item to be wrapped, pulling it over the item, spreading the hood in several steps to achieve uniform stretching, transversely stretching the hood. The tube is shaped with a stretch of at least 50 per cent before a transverse seam is welded. An Independent claim is also included for an arrangement for wrapping items, especially item stacks, with stretched foil.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren/eine Vorrichtung zum Umhüllen von Stückgut mit einer aus einem Folienschlauch (3) durch Abschweißung und Abtrennen gebildeten, wenigstens 10% horizontal quergestretchten Stretchfolienhaube (3'), deren Haubendeckel im Umhüllungszustand unter biaxialer Horizontaldehnung an der Oberseite (2') des Stückgutes (2) anliegt, und die vor dem Querstretchen und Überziehen vollständig aufgespreizt und dann so quergestretcht wird, daß der Abstand ihrer Eckkanten (e''1, e''2, e''3, e''4) zu der jeweils benachbarten Stückgut-Eckkante (e'1, e'2, e'3, e'4) i.w. gleich groß ist, wobei der flach zugeführte Folienschlauch (3) bei einem Querstretch (q) von wenigstens etwa 50 % so formatiert wird, daß sich jeweils die beiden Schenkel (B-Q, C-Q bzw. A-P, D-P) der V-bzw. dreiecksförmigen Folien-Doppelungsbereiche des Haubendeckels im noch i.w. ungedehnten Aufspreizzustand der Haube wenigstens etwa bis an die jeweils benachbarte, rechtwinklig zur Quernaht (6) verlaufende zweite Kante (B-C = Bezugslinie La; A-D = Bezugslinie LB) der unterhalb des Quernahtbereiches vorhandenen, i.w. geometrisch ähnlich zur horizontalen Stückgut-Querschnittsfläche ausgebildeten Hauben-Aufspreiz-Querschnittsfläche heranerstrecken, vorzugsweise jeweils in diese hinein. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 9/13

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 9/13 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 9/135 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0399540 A1 19901128 - BEUMER MASCHF BERNHARD [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19933856 A1 20010125; AT 294103 T 20050515; DK 1072514 T3 20050829; EP 1072514 A1 20010131; EP 1072514 B1 20050427; ES 2238953 T3 20050916

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090721

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090722

2010-09-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090722

2010-07-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090721

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090721

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090721

2010-03-08 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2010-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BEUMER G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20090731

2009-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090126

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080723

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080711

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080718

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080729

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080703

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080721

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20080721

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080821

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-07 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2008-05-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: BEUMER GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20080304

2007-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: BEUMER G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.OELDER STRASSE 40, D-592

- Effective date: 20050427

2007-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: BEUMER G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20050427

2006-04-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060130

2006-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-02-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-10-10 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051010

2005-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2238953 T3

2005-08-29 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-27 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050727

2005-07-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050727

2005-07-21 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-07-21 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-06-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50010144 P 20050602

2005-05-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-05-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050427

2005-04-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-04-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-04-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-04-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050427

2005-04-27 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050427

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030227

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010726

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI