Global Patent Index - EP 1072517 A1

EP 1072517 A1 2001-01-31 - Apparatus for bagging garments

Title (en)

Apparatus for bagging garments

Title (de)

Gerät zum Umhüllen von Kleidungsstücken

Title (fr)

APPAREIL POUR ENVELOPPER DES VETEMENTS

Publication

EP 1072517 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00114731 A

Priority

DE 19933394 A

Abstract (en)

The device for wrapping items of clothing in a plastic sleeve with transverse seals at top and bottom, especially for use in dry cleaning shops, comprises a frame (1) with a sleeve feed and top and bottom heat sealing devices with jaws (4, 4', 5, 5'). The operation of the jaws is synchronised by connecting them with a bowden cable (10).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Gerät zum Umhüllen von Kleidungsstücken mit einem beidendig im wesentlichen quer zu versiegelnden Folienschlauch, insbesondere zur Verwendung im Reinigungsgewerbe. Dieses Gerät besteht aus einem galgenartigen Gestell (1) mit Folienschlauchzuführung, an dem zum Versiegeln des Folienschlauches vertikal übereinander zwei gegeneinander verstell- und beheizbare Quersiegeleinrichtungen (2, 3) mit jeweils zwei gegeneinander anlegbaren Quersiegelbacken (4, 4', 5, 5') angeordnet sind. Ein solches Gerät ist nach der Erfindung derart ausgebildet, dass die Quersiegeleinrichtungen (2, 3) zur Bewegungssynchronisierung der Quersiegelbacken (4, 4', 5, 5') miteinander mittels eines aus einem Zug- (9) und einem Hüllstrang (10) bestehenden Bowdenzuges (8) wirkverbunden sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 25/20; B65B 51/30; B65B 59/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 25/20 (2006.01); B65B 51/30 (2006.01); B65B 59/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 51/30 (2013.01); B65B 25/20 (2013.01); B65B 59/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 8230595 U1

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072517 A1 20010131; EP 1072517 B1 20041222; DE 19933394 A1 20010208

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090708

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090708

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090708

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080625

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080630

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080724

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080619

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-08-29 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-12-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050923

2005-11-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050310

2005-01-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008998 P 20050127

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-12-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010606

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI