Global Patent Index - EP 1072530 A1

EP 1072530 A1 2001-01-31 - An assembly for two products to be mixed just prior to use

Title (en)

An assembly for two products to be mixed just prior to use

Title (de)

Einheit für zwei gerade vor dem Gebrauch zu vermischende Produkte

Title (fr)

Ensemble pour deux produits devant être mélangés juste avant l'emploi

Publication

EP 1072530 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99113993 A

Priority

EP 99113993 A

Abstract (en)

The invention concerns an assembly for two products to be mixed just prior to use comprising a container (4), an aseptic, UHT, sterilised or pasteurised product filled in said container and completely sealed with a first membrane (6) and a supplement disposed in a second container (1) completely sealed in an internal space of a cap (9) with a second membrane (7) providing barrier properties, the first membrane of the container facing directly the second membrane of the second container ,said cap comprising cutting means (32) for the first and/or the second membrane. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 51/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 51/28 (2006.01); B65D 81/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 51/2814 (2013.01); B65D 81/3205 (2013.01); B65D 81/3222 (2013.01); B65D 81/3238 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0561322 A1 19930922 - LAMEPLAST SRL [IT]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072530 A1 20010131; AU 6563700 A 20010205; WO 0105675 A1 20010125

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020914

2002-06-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020503

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI