Global Patent Index - EP 1072533 A1

EP 1072533 A1 2001-01-31 - Package case for electric appliances and computers

Title (en)

Package case for electric appliances and computers

Title (de)

Verpackung für elektrische Geräte und Computer

Title (fr)

Emballage pour appareils électriques et ordinateurs

Publication

EP 1072533 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99114444 A

Priority

EP 99114444 A

Abstract (en)

A package case for electric appliances and computers consists of an upper case and a lower case made of a tough thin plastic plate formed to have four sides and a bottom, an hollow interior defined by the four sides and the bottom and having a shape to correspond to the shape of a product to be packaged. Each of the four sides has a sloped outer and inner wall, and a plurality of curved recesses formed in the sloped outer and the inner wall and in the top of each side. The hollow package case placed in a carton may have excellent shock-absorbing function to protect a product packaged therein from damage or hurt caused by shocks or lowering movement in transporting. It is of low cost, handy to handle, reducing pollution to the environment, and having enough shock-absorbing ability for protecting electric appliances and Computers. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 81/02; B65D 81/133

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/133 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/133 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072533 A1 20010131

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-02 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20060324

2004-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040927

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010622

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI