Global patent index - EP 1072548 A2

EP 1072548 A2 2001-01-31 - Device and method for stacking flat goods

Title (en)

Device and method for stacking flat goods

Title (de)

Vorrichtung sowie Verfahren zum Stapeln von flächigen Gütern

Title (fr)

Dispositif et méthode pour empiler des articles plats

Publication

EP 1072548 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00115706 A

Priority

DE 19935665 A

Abstract (en)

The goods holding unit (57) has a combined transport storage unit (17) for supplying the goods (2) to the stacking places (7,8). So that the unit by means of a control unit is movable down from a transport speed (V1) to a storage speed (V0) and with or after reaching the storage speed, the delivery of the respective goods result. The control unit ensures that the braking operation is executed selectively relative to one of the stacking places, or no braking is carried out, if the goods are conveyed away across at least one stacking place and is transported to the following or one of the following stack pieces, braked there and stored there. The goods holding unit has a switchable vacuum or magnetic field for the holding or release of the goods.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung (1) zum Aufeinanderschichten von flächigen Gütern (2), insbesondere von Blechtafeln, auf mehrere, hintereinanderliegende Stapelorte (7,8), mit einer die Güter (2) zueinander überlappungsfrei hintereinanderliegend anliefernden, als Überkopfeinrichtung (49) ausgebildeten, eine schaltbare Güter-Halteeinrichtung (57) aufweisenden, kombinierten Transport-Ablageeinrichtung (17) zur Zuführung der Güter (2) zu den Stapelorten (7,8), wobei die Transport-Ablageeinrichtung (17) mittels einer Steuereinrichtung von einer Transportgeschwindigkeit (V1) auf eine Ablagegeschwindigkeit (V0) herunterfahrbar ist und daß bei beziehungsweise nach Erreichen der Ablagegeschwindigkeit (V0) die Abgabe des jeweiligen Guts (2) erfolgt, wobei mittels der Steuereinrichtung wahlweise der Bremsvorgang bezogen auf einen der Stapelorte (7,8) erfolgt oder keine Abbremsung vorgenommen wird, wenn das Gut (2) über mindestens einen der Stapel-orte (7) hinweggefördert und zu dem folgenden oder einen der folgenden Stapelorte (8) transportiert sowie dort abgebremst und dort abgelegt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 31/24; B21D 43/22; B65H 29/32; B65H 29/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/30 (2006.01); B65H 29/32 (2006.01); B65H 29/68 (2006.01); B65H 31/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 31/24 (2013.01); B65H 29/30 (2013.01); B65H 29/32 (2013.01); B65H 29/68 (2013.01); B65H 2406/323 (2013.01); B65H 2511/20 (2013.01); B65H 2513/22 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2511/20 + B65H 2220/01
  2. B65H 2513/22 + B65H 2220/02

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072548 A2 20010131; EP 1072548 A3 20011017; EP 1072548 B1 20051026; DE 19935665 A1 20010301; DE 19935665 B4 20040408; DE 50011418 D1 20051201; ES 2251338 T3 20060501

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160729

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160905

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150713

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-05-23 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: KBA-METALPRINT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20120510

2012-05-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KBA-METALPRINT GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50011418

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120328

2011-09-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50011418

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2006-10-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060727

2006-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2251338

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-12-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50011418

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-12-01

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-10-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2005-02-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: DEVICE AND METHOD FOR STACKING FLAT GOODS

2003-08-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030701

2002-07-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2002-07-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES GB IT

2002-06-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020417

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI