Global Patent Index - EP 1072554 A1

EP 1072554 A1 2001-01-31 - Crane with telescopic boom

Title (en)

Crane with telescopic boom

Title (de)

Kran mit einem Teleskopausleger

Title (fr)

Grue à flèche téléscopique

Publication

EP 1072554 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00115005 A

Priority

  • DE 29913333 U
  • DE 20003355 U

Abstract (en)

The telescopic jib has e.g. three nested tubular sections which may be held in their retracted position by spring-loaded bolts (7,8). The bolt holding the innermost (6) and middle (5) tubes together may be released to allow the middle tube to be extended until the hydraulic actuator is at its greatest extension. The bolt may engage in a hole to hold the tube while claws fastening the inner end of the cylinder to the end of the tube are released. The actuator is retracted ant its outer end is then clamped to the end of the tube for a further lift. The process may then be repeated with the middle tube, extending it with respect to the outer tube (4).

Abstract (de)

Aus dem Grundausleger (4) mit Auslegeranlenkstück (3) eines Teleskopauslegers eines Krans sind Schüsse (5,6) austeleskopierbar, die in ihren jeweils aus- oder eingefahrenen Stellungen durch Verriegelungsbolzen (7,8) verriegelt sind. Nach dem Lösen der verriegelnden Bolzenverbindungen sind die Schüsse (5,6) mit einer einstufigen hydraulischen Kolbenzylindereinheit (1,2), die einendig an dem Auslegeranlenkstück (3) befestigt ist, dadurch jeweils durch zwei Hübe aus- und einfahrbar, daß jeder aus- oder einzufahrende Schuß (5,6) einmal mit dem inneren und einmal mit dem äußeren Endbereich (2) des verschieblichen Teils der Kolbenzylindereinheit (1,2) gekuppelt wird. Auf dem Zylinder (2) ist ein verschieblicher Ring oder eine verschiebliche Buchse (9) mit einer Kupplungseinrichtung zum Ankuppeln der Schüsse (5,6) geführt, der oder die sowohl mit dem inneren als auch mit dem äußeren Endbereich des Zylinders (2) verriegelbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66C 23/693

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 23/687 (2006.01); B66C 23/693 (2006.01); B66C 23/70 (2006.01); F15B 15/14 (2006.01); F15B 15/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/149 (2013.01); B66C 23/705 (2013.01); F15B 15/1466 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

US 6527131 B1 20030304; EP 1072554 A1 20010131; EP 1072554 B1 20040317; JP 2001080883 A 20010327; JP 5044828 B2 20121010

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160801

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150721

2016-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150721

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150727

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140717

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-03-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041220

2004-11-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040628

2004-04-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50005657 P 20040422

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-03-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010412

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI