Global Patent Index - EP 1072555 A1

EP 1072555 A1 2001-01-31 - Corkscrew with counter

Title (en)

Corkscrew with counter

Title (de)

Korkenzieher mit Zähler

Title (fr)

Tire-bouchon avec compteur

Publication

EP 1072555 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401838 A

Priority

FR 9909518 A

Abstract (en)

The corkscrew consists of a spiral (1) with its end (2) fixed to a handle (3) which incorporates a detector linked to a counter (4). The detector can be in the form of an effort sensor which responds to a force applied to the spiral when a cork is extracted, e.g. a stress gauge, piezoelectric element, or a mechanical system; it can be, for example, in the form of a sliding ring (9) and spring (12) which interact with the cork and actuate a mechanical counter or an electrical one operated by a power source (7) in the handle.

Abstract (fr)

Tire-bouchon comprenant une hélice (1) ayant une extrémité (2) fixée sur un manche (3), un moyen (9) de détection d'au moins une action prédéterminée sur le tire-bouchon directement liée à une extraction d'un bouchon et un moyen (4) de comptage et d'affichage du nombre d'extractions effectuées, le moyen de détection (9) étant fonctionnellement associé au moyen de comptage et d'affichage (4) pour commander une incrémentation du nombre d'extractions affiché. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67B 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67B 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67B 7/04 (2013.01); B67B 7/0411 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072555 A1 20010131; FR 2796634 A1 20010126; FR 2796634 B1 20010914

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060607

2005-08-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050620

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010615

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI