Global Patent Index - EP 1072580 A1

EP 1072580 A1 2001-01-31 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING CHLOROMETHYLPHENYLACETIC ACID

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR PRODUCING CHLOROMETHYLPHENYLACETIC ACID

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON CHLOROMETHYLPHENYLESSIGSÄURE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'ACIDE CHLOROMETHYLPHENYLACETIQUE

Publication

EP 1072580 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99917085 A

Priority

  • JP 9902125 W
  • JP 11203198 A

Abstract (en)

A process for producing chloromethylphenylacetic acid represented by formula (II) which comprises reacting methylphenylacetic acid represented by formula (I) with chlorine gas in an inert solvent under photoirradiation or in the presence of a radical initiator. According to this process, the methyl group of the methylphenylacetic acid can be chlorinated without resort to toxic sulfuryl chloride as a chlorinating agent and thus highly pure chloromethylphenylacetic acid can be produced at a high yield while inhibiting the formation of by-products such as the dichloro compound and the alpha -chloro compound. <CHEM>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07C 51/363; C07C 57/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07C 51/363 (2006.01); C07C 57/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07C 51/363 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C07C 51/363 + C07C 57/58

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072580 A1 20010131; EP 1072580 A4 20050216; EP 1072580 B1 20101201; DE 69942998 D1 20110113; JP 3874925 B2 20070131; JP H11302220 A 19991102; US 6414186 B1 20020702; WO 9954275 A1 19991028

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160421

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161101

2017-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160430

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160502

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160421

2017-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160430

2017-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161230

2016-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160421

2016-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69942998

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150316

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150424

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150429

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150313

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150311

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-03-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-12-29 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 69942998

- Effective date: 20110902

2011-11-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110902

2011-01-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP

2011-01-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69942998 P 20110113

2010-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2010-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2010-12-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080620

2005-02-16 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20050105

2002-03-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IHARA CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD.

2001-09-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001019

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI