Global Patent Index - EP 1072623 A2

EP 1072623 A2 2001-01-31 - Polyvalent metal salts of salicyclic acid resin and process for the preparation thereof

Title (en)

Polyvalent metal salts of salicyclic acid resin and process for the preparation thereof

Title (de)

Polyvalentes Metallsalz von Salicylsäureharz und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung

Title (fr)

Sel métallique polyvalent d'une résine de l'acide salicylique et procédé pour sa fabrication

Publication

EP 1072623 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00105409 A

Priority

  • KR 19990029619 A
  • KR 20000003589 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a process for preparing polyvalent metal salts of salicylic acid resin, comprising reacting salicylic acid or its derivative and styrene or its derivative in the presence of zinc salt of organic carboxylic acid and/or polyvalent metal compound at 50 to 200 DEG C to prepare the reaction product, and reacting the reaction product with polyvalent metal compound; an aqueous dispersion where the polyvalent metal salt of resin is dispersed in water; and to a color development sheet prepared from the polyvalent metal salts of salicylic acid resin.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08G 61/02; B41M 5/155

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/124 (2006.01); B41M 5/155 (2006.01); C07B 61/00 (2006.01); C07C 51/41 (2006.01); C07C 65/10 (2006.01); C08G 61/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/155 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072623 A2 20010131; EP 1072623 A3 20030102; CA 2300773 A1 20010121; JP 2001048830 A 20010220; KR 20000024154 A 20000506

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-10-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-09-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI