Global patent index - EP 1072671 A1

EP 1072671 A1 2001-01-31 - Process for combustion of a sulphur-containing liquid fuel with reduced emission of sulphur oxides, and corresponding combustion plant

Title (en)

Process for combustion of a sulphur-containing liquid fuel with reduced emission of sulphur oxides, and corresponding combustion plant

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Verbrennung eines Schwefel enthaltenden flüssigen Brennstoffs mit reduzierter Emission von Schwefeloxiden und Anlage zur Durchführung desselben

Title (fr)

Procédé de combustion d' un combustible liquide contenant du soufre avec émission réduite d' oxydes de soufre et appareilage pour ce procédé

Publication

EP 1072671 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99114961 A

Priority

EP 99114961 A

Abstract (en)

Process for combustion of a sulphur-containing liquid fuel with reduced emission of sulphur oxides (SOx) and corresponding combustion plant, in which combustion is performed of an emulsion comprising a continuous phase consisting of the liquid fuel and an aqueous phase, dispersed in the said continuous phase, in which a sorbent capable of reducing the emission of SOx is introduced. The amount of sulphur sorbent is determined as a function of the quantity of sulphur present in the fuel and of the maximum permissible concentration of SOx in the gaseous effluents, and in the emulsion the aqueous solution of the sorbent is dispersed in the liquid fuel in the form of particles having a mean diameter such as to obtain an SOx reduction efficiency of at least 90%. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10L 1/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10L 1/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10L 1/328 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072671 A1 20010131

INPADOC legal status

2005-02-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040727

2003-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030613

2002-06-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CAM TECNOLOGIE S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010709

2001-10-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CAMFIN S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI