Global Patent Index - EP 1072673 A2

EP 1072673 A2 2001-01-31 - Perfume compositions

Title (en)

Perfume compositions

Title (de)

Riechstoffkompositionen

Title (fr)

Compositions parfumantes

Publication

EP 1072673 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00870065 A

Priority

  • EP 00870065 A
  • EP 99870163 A

Abstract (en)

There is provided a laundry and cleaning composition comprising a bleaching system and a selected perfume composition, wherein the perfume composition comprises perfume ingredients selected from the classes of unsaturated perfume ingredients of ester, ether, alcohol, aldehyde, ketone, nitrile, lactone, schiff-bases, terpenes and derivatives thereof, cyclic alkene, cyclic oxide, oxime, and mixtures thereof. Also provided herein is the perfume composition, wherein the amount of unsaturated materials represents at least 40% by weight of the perfume composition.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/50; C11D 3/39; C11D 3/395

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06L 3/02 (2006.01); C11B 9/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01); C11D 3/395 (2006.01); C11D 3/50 (2006.01); C11D 17/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/3907 (2013.01); C11D 3/50 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072673 A2 20010131; EP 1072673 A3 20010321; AU 6103200 A 20010205; BR 0012672 A 20020409; CA 2379200 A1 20010125; CN 1361817 A 20020731; JP 2004513188 A 20040430; MX PA02000796 A 20020722; WO 0105919 A2 20010125; WO 0105919 A3 20010802

INPADOC legal status


2007-02-21 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20061012

2004-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040604

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010611

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI