Global Patent Index - EP 1072674 A1

EP 1072674 A1 2001-01-31 - Coated detergent tablet

Title (en)

Coated detergent tablet

Title (de)

Beschichtetes Reinigungsmittel in Tablettenform

Title (fr)

Comprimé détergent sous forme de tablette enrobée

Publication

EP 1072674 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99870167 A

Priority

EP 99870167 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a coated detergent tablet, the coating comprising a cation exchange resin.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/00; C11D 3/20; C11D 3/37

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/37 (2013.01); C11D 3/2082 (2013.01); C11D 17/0082 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072674 A1 20010131; AR 024958 A1 20021030; AU 6378600 A 20010213; BR 0012758 A 20020402; CA 2379523 A1 20010201; CN 1364192 A 20020814; EP 1198552 A1 20020424; KR 20020011144 A 20020207; MX PA02000923 A 20020730; WO 0107559 A1 20010201

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040119

2003-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030708

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI