Global Patent Index - EP 1072691 A2

EP 1072691 A2 2001-01-31 - Tool steel with excellent workability, machinability and heat treatment characteristics, and die using same

Title (en)

Tool steel with excellent workability, machinability and heat treatment characteristics, and die using same

Title (de)

Wärmebehandlungsfähiger Werkzeugstahl mit hervorragender Bearbeitbarkeit und Kaltumformbarkeit; Matrizen aus diesem Stahl

Title (fr)

Acier à outils facilement façonnable, usinable et apte au traitement thermique ; matrices fabriquées dudit acier

Publication

EP 1072691 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99123519 A

Priority

JP 21622799 A

Abstract (en)

Provided is a tool steel which contains, by weight, C and Cr in both of which (Cr + 5.9 x C) is 9.1 to 12.5, (Cr - 4.2 x C) being not more than 5 and (Cr - 6.3 x C) being not less than 2.2. In addition to these elements, this tool steel preferably contains 0.1 to 0.6% Si, 0.1 to 1.2% Mn, at least one of Mo and W of 0.6 to 1.25% in total in terms of (Mo + 1/2W), less than 0.5% V, not more than 0.12% S, not more than 100 ppm of Ca, and the balance Fe and incidental impurities. Moreover, in this tool steel, the Cr segregation range in matrix after hardening is not more than 1% by weight, or the maximum tempering hardness by tempering at a temperature of not lower than 500 DEG C is not less than 57 HRC, or a size variation due to heat treatment occurring by tempering at a temperature of not lower than 500 DEG C is not more than 0.1% relative to the size measured just before hardening in terms of linear expansion coefficient and a size variation due to heat treatment by tempering at 490 DEG C is not more than 0. Provided is also a die made by tempering the steel of the invention to a hardness of not less than 55 HRC and cutting the steel. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 38/22; C22C 38/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/06 (2006.01); C22C 38/22 (2006.01); C22C 38/24 (2006.01); C22C 38/44 (2006.01); C22C 38/46 (2006.01); C22C 38/60 (2006.01); C21D 1/25 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/60 (2013.01); C22C 38/06 (2013.01); C22C 38/22 (2013.01); C22C 38/24 (2013.01); C22C 38/44 (2013.01); C22C 38/46 (2013.01); C21D 1/25 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072691 A2 20010131; EP 1072691 A3 20020123; EP 1072691 B1 20040519; AT 267274 T 20040615; CN 1097642 C 20030101; CN 1282798 A 20010207; DE 69917444 D1 20040624; DE 69917444 T2 20050602; KR 100368541 B1 20030124; KR 20010012039 A 20010215; TW 499488 B 20020821

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091126

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091125

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100730

2010-06-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081112

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20081107

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20081112

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081120

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-05-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050222

2005-02-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-06-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69917444 P 20040624

2004-06-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR SE

2002-10-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR SE

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020607

2002-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020222

2002-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR SE

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI