Global Patent Index - EP 1072702 A2

EP 1072702 A2 2001-01-31 - Spinning device and method

Title (en)

Spinning device and method

Title (de)

Spinnvorrichtung und Spinnverfahren

Title (fr)

Dispositif de filage et procédé à filer

Publication

EP 1072702 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00109281 A

Priority

  • JP 21402599 A
  • JP 24608899 A
  • JP 32369799 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention provides a spinning device that can reduce errors during preparations for joining and that enables stable joining. In a true-twist spinning device S including a hollow guide shaft 15 having a spun-yarn passage 23 through which a spun yarn Y passes, and spinning nozzles 14 for generating whirling air currents near a tip of the hollow guide shaft 15, the spun-yarn passage 23 is formed to broaden toward a yarn ejection side, and yarn picking-up nozzles 29 are provided in the middle of the spun-yarn passage 23 for injecting compressed air. By injecting compressed air from the yarn picking-up nozzles 29 during joining, a suction force is generated in the spun-yarn passage 23 to allow a fiber bundle 6, which have been whirled by the spinning nozzles 14, to be introduced into the spun-yarn passage 23 for yarn picking-up spinning. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 5/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/115 (2006.01); D01H 4/02 (2006.01); D01H 4/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 4/02 (2013.01); D01H 1/115 (2013.01); D01H 15/002 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072702 A2 20010131; EP 1072702 A3 20011017; EP 1072702 B1 20040331; DE 60009402 D1 20040506; DE 60009402 T2 20050310

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60009402

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE WEICKMANN & WEICKMANN, DE

2015-05-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60009402

- Representative's name: WEICKMANN & WEICKMANN PATENTANWAELTE - RECHTSA, DE

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: MURATA KIKAI KABUSHIKI KAISHA

- Free text: MURATA KIKAI KABUSHIKI KAISHA#3 MINAMI, OCHIAI-CHO, KISSHOIN#MINAMI-KU, KYOTO-SHI, KYOTO 601 (JP) -TRANSFER TO- MURATA KIKAI KABUSHIKI KAISHA#3 MINAMI, OCHIAI-CHO, KISSHOIN#MINAMI-KU, KYOTO-SHI, KYOTO 601 (JP)

2005-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050104

2004-07-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60009402 P 20040506

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE LI

2004-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-12-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021024

2002-07-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE LI

2002-05-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020311

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7D 01H 5/28 A, 7D 01H 4/48 B, 7D 01H 4/02 B, 7D 01H 1/115 B

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE LI

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI