Global Patent Index - EP 1072708 A3

EP 1072708 A3 2001-02-28 - Joining several knitted fabrics on a flat bed knitting machine

Title (en)

Joining several knitted fabrics on a flat bed knitting machine

Title (de)

Verbinden mehrerer Gestrickteile auf einer Flachstrickmaschine

Title (fr)

Relier plusieurs pièces tricotées sur une tricoteuse rectiligne

Publication

EP 1072708 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00120010 A

Priority

  • DE 19616004 A
  • EP 97922854 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19616004A1] A process is disclosed for joining several knitted fabrics on a flatbed knitting machine. Several knitted fabrics (10, 14, 20) are produced successively or in different areas of the flatbed knitting machine, then joined by knitting-on or another usual technique for joining stitches on different needle beds. When two knitted fabrics are produced on a single needle bed, it is necessary to hang one knitted fabric onto an auxiliary or supplementary needle bed and to offset the latter sideways, so that the desired joining areas may be knitted together.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 1/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/22 (2006.01); D04B 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/22 (2013.01); D04B 1/108 (2013.01); D10B 2403/032 (2013.01); D10B 2505/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19616004 A1 19971023; DE 59712805 D1 20070315; EP 0904438 A1 19990331; EP 0904438 B1 20011219; EP 1070777 A2 20010124; EP 1070777 A3 20010314; EP 1070777 B1 20050126; EP 1072708 A2 20010131; EP 1072708 A3 20010228; EP 1074651 A2 20010207; EP 1074651 A3 20020327; EP 1074651 B1 20070124; JP 2001501258 A 20010130; US 6205822 B1 20010327; US 6257024 B1 20010710; WO 9740219 A1 19971030

INPADOC legal status


2007-04-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061010

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031111

2002-01-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GEBRUEDER ACHTER GMBH & CO. KG

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010827

2001-08-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RECARO GMBH & CO.

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-01-31 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 904438

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT