Global Patent Index - EP 1072710 A1

EP 1072710 A1 2001-01-31 - Flat bed knitting machine with at least one needle bed

Title (en)

Flat bed knitting machine with at least one needle bed

Title (de)

Flachstrickmaschine mit mindestens einem Nadelbett

Title (fr)

Métier à tricoter rectiligne pourvu d'au moins un lit d'aiguilles

Publication

EP 1072710 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00107204 A

Priority

DE 19936067 A

Abstract (en)

The flatbed knitter has at least one needle bed, and a lock slide (50) moving along the needle bed. At least one functional unit, and especially the yarn guide, also moves along the needle bed and it is powered through the drive (30) for the lock slide so that its movements are synchronized with the lock slide (50). The lock slide drive (30) has at least one driver (2) which is not linked to the lock slide (50), to engage a functional unit and synchronize its movements with the lock slide (50). At least one driver (2) rides in a rail (1), parallel to at least one needle bed, with a chain or belt (3) or cable transmission from the lock slide drive (30). The driver (2) is at a continuous chain or toothed belt (3), which passes around two deflection rollers (6,7). At least one deflection roller (6,7) is rotated by the motor shaft (30) of the lock slide drive. The synchronized movements of the driver (2) with the lock slide (50) ensure that its vertical center axis (55) coincides with the vertical center axis (55) of the knitting system lock of the slide (50). At least one driver (2) can be engaged with a number of functional units. The driver (2) has one or more controlled and adjustable slides (22) which, in the functioning position, engage limit surfaces of at least one functional unit.

Abstract (de)

Eine Flachstrickmaschine mit mindestens einem Nadelbett und mindestens einem längs des mindestens einen Nadelbetts bewegbaren Schlitten sowie mindestens einem längs des mindestens einen Nadelbetts bewegbar gelagerten Funktionselement, wobei das mindestens eine Funktionselement durch den Schlittenantrieb (30) synchron zu dem mindestens einen Schlitten (50) antreibbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 15/96

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 15/36 (2006.01); D04B 15/38 (2006.01); D04B 15/56 (2006.01); D04B 15/96 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 15/56 (2013.01); D04B 15/90 (2013.01); D04B 15/96 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072710 A1 20010131; EP 1072710 B1 20040721; CN 1161508 C 20040811; CN 1282809 A 20010207; DE 19936067 A1 20010201; ES 2222127 T3 20050201; JP 2001115366 A 20010424; JP 3965594 B2 20070829; PT 1072710 E 20041130

INPADOC legal status


2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120401

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110310

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-06-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2007-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060403

2006-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061101

2006-04-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060403

2006-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060102

2005-07-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050422

2005-04-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050418

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-03-10 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050310

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2222127 T3

2004-11-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20041015

2004-08-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007109 P 20040826

2004-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT PT

2004-07-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HERRN STOLL, THOMAS DIPL.-ING.

2004-07-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HERRN SCHMID, FRANZ,DIPL.-ING.

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES IT PT

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010612

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT PT

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI