Global Patent Index - EP 1072718 A1

EP 1072718 A1 2001-01-31 - Device and method for deodorizing and disinfecting laundry

Title (en)

Device and method for deodorizing and disinfecting laundry

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Desodorieren und Desinfizieren von Wäsche

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procéde pour déodoriser et désinfecter le linge

Publication

EP 1072718 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00115857 A

Priority

DE 19935984 A

Abstract (en)

A domestic washer-drier (1) has a circulating air circuit (7) for a drying air flow that has a rotating drum (2) for the accommodation of the wash (5), a fan (3) to generate the drying air flow, a heater (4) to warm up the drying air flow and a device (6) that can be effective exclusively in a region outside the drum for the deactivation of aromatic substances and/or illness exciters. The circulating air circuit has an auxiliary branch for transitory subdivision of a part of the drying air flow. The device for making the aromatic substances and/or illness exciters ineffective can be effective in the region of the auxiliary branch.

Abstract (de)

Um in einem Hauhaltwäschetrockner 1 Wäsche 5 zu desinfizieren und/oder zu desodorieren wird mittels eines Gebläses 3 ein Trockenluftstrom im Umluftkreislauf 7 durch eine Trommel 2 zur Aufnahme der zu trocknenden Wäsche 5, durch einen Kondensator 8 zum Entfeuchten der Trocknungsluft und anschließend durch eine Heizeinrichtung 4 zum Erwärmen des Trockenluftstroms geleitet, wobei im Umluftkreislauf 7 eine Einrichtung 6 zum Unwirksammachen von Geruchsstoffen und/oder Krankheitserregern angeordnet ist, die ausschließlich in einem Bereich außerhalb der Trommel 2 wirksam sein kann. Zum Unwirksammachen von Geruchsstoffen und/oder Krankheitserregern können Filter zum Binden oder insbesondere mit Katalysatoren ausgerüstete Vorrichtungen zum Zerstören der Geruchsstoffe und/oder der Krankheitserreger verwendet werden. Die Wäsche wird auf diese Weise nicht den Mitteln zum Unwirksammachen von Geruchsstoffen und/oder Krankheitserregern ausgesetzt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 58/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 58/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 58/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072718 A1 20010131; DE 19935984 A1 20010201

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031021

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2002-10-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020910

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20010731

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010221

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI