Global Patent Index - EP 1072720 A2

EP 1072720 A2 2001-01-31 - Method and device for manufacturing a fibrous web

Title (en)

Method and device for manufacturing a fibrous web

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung einer Faserstoffbahn

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la fabrication d'une bande fibreuse

Publication

EP 1072720 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00109696 A

Priority

DE 19935481 A

Abstract (en)

In the production of a fiber web, for paper or cardboard, while the web (12) is still wet it is stretched laterally to set the web characteristics and particularly the web structure and/or the fiber orientation. The web (12) is stretched laterally, while still wet and with a solid content of 5-65% and preferably 15-25%. The wet web (12) is transferred to a continuous and elastic belt (14). The belt (14) is stretched longitudinally before the transfer point (A), and the stretch is measured in different directions. The longitudinal stretch on the belt (14) results in a lateral contraction, to give a set lateral reassertion after the transfer point (A) which carries the web (12) with it and stretches the web (12) laterally. The stretch behavior of the elastic belt (14) is measured differently for width and thickness so that, on a longitudinal expansion and contraction, only a width contraction or expansion takes place without a change in the belt thickness. The elastic belt (14) is stretched longitudinally directly in front of the web transfer point (A) by at least one powered roller (16), and preferably at least two rollers (16,20,22). The web (12) is transferred to the elastic belt (14) at the zone of the final belt tensioning roller (16). The elastic belt (14) also acts as a press blanket for the web (12), or as a transfer belt. A belt (14) is used which has different stretch characteristics across its width, and with a closed or porous surface. The web (12) is transferred to the elastic belt (14) by a carrier (18) and especially a fourdrinier, or a transfer belt. The lateral stretch imposed on the web (12) increases the lateral orientation of the web fibers and sets the web structure. An Independent claim is included for a section of a papermaking or cardboard production machine (10), with an elastic belt (14) and a powered roller (16) to impose a lateral stretch on the web (12).

Abstract (de)

Es werden ein Verfahren sowie eine Vorrichtung zur Herstellung einer Faserstoffbahn (12) wie insbesondere einer Papier- oder Kartonbahn beschrieben, bei denen die Faserstoffbahn (12) zur Beeinflussung bestimmter Bahneigenschaften wie insbesondere der Bahnstruktur und/oder der Faserorientierung entsprechend behandelt wird. Dabei wird die Faserstoffbahn (12) zur Beeinflussung der betreffenden Bahneigenschaften im noch nassen Zustand in Querrichtung entsprechend gedehnt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 2/00; D21F 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 2/00 (2006.01); D21F 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 2/00 (2013.01); D21F 11/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072720 A2 20010131; EP 1072720 A3 20010816; EP 1072720 B1 20050316; DE 19935481 A1 20010208; US 6488810 B1 20021203

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-05-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060509

2006-05-08 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060508

2006-03-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051219

2005-05-13 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20050513

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-05-12 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050512

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-05-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050510

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-05-10 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-04-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50009762 P 20050421

2005-03-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2004-06-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040420

2002-05-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI SE

2002-04-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020218

2001-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI