Global Patent Index - EP 1072722 A2

EP 1072722 A2 2001-01-31 - Dryer section

Title (en)

Dryer section

Title (de)

Trockenpartie

Title (fr)

Section de séchage

Publication

EP 1072722 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00111225 A

Priority

DE 19935138 A

Abstract (en)

The drying station (12) for a wet fiber web (14) has at least one deflection flow dryer (16), where the web (14) is subjected to a deflected hot air and/or hot steam flow at least at one side.

Abstract (de)

In einer Trockenpartie 10 einer Maschine zur Herstellung einer Materialbahn wie insbesondere Papier- oder Kartonbahn ist die Materialbahn 12 ausgehend vom letzten Preßnip 14 einer Pressenpartie 16 über wenigstens eine gerade oder leicht gekrümmte Strecke 18 in geschlossenem Zug zu einer insbesondere größeren Stützwalze 20 mit zugeordnetem Prallströmungstrockner 22 geführt, durch den die über die Stützwalze 20 geführte Materialbahn 12 mit einer Heißluft- und / oder Heißdampfprallströmung beaufschlagbar ist, wobei die gerade oder leicht gekrümmte Strecke 18 als Prallströmungstrocknungs- und / oder als Transferfoil-Strecke vorgesehen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 5/00; D21F 5/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/00 (2006.01); D21F 5/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/00 (2013.01); D21F 5/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6442865 B1 20020903; EP 1072722 A2 20010131; EP 1072722 A3 20010509; EP 1072722 B1 20041201

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130525

2014-02-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50008807

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110526

2012-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20120511

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120523

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-01-10 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100517

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-11-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050902

2005-02-15 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008807 P 20050105

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031117

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI SE

2002-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011109

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI