Global Patent Index - EP 1072722 A3

EP 1072722 A3 2001-05-09 - Dryer section

Title (en)

Dryer section

Title (de)

Trockenpartie

Title (fr)

Section de séchage

Publication

EP 1072722 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00111225 A

Priority

DE 19935138 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6442865B1] Drying section of a machine for producing a material web. The drying section includes a support roll with an associated impingement dryer, and at least one straight or curved section forming at least a part of a closed path between a last nip of a press section adjacent the drying section and the support roll. The support roll and the impingement dryer are arranged to guide the material web over the support roll, and, thereby, to subject the material web to at least one of hot air and hot steam impingement. The at least one straight or slightly curved section is structured and arranged to form at least one of an impingement drying section and a transfer foil section.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 5/00; D21F 5/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/00 (2006.01); D21F 5/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/00 (2013.01); D21F 5/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6442865 B1 20020903; EP 1072722 A2 20010131; EP 1072722 A3 20010509; EP 1072722 B1 20041201

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130525

2014-02-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50008807

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110526

2012-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20120511

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120523

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-01-10 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100517

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-11-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050902

2005-02-15 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008807 P 20050105

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031117

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI SE

2002-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011109

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI