Global Patent Index - EP 1072723 A3

EP 1072723 A3 2001-04-25 - Heated drying cylinder

Title (en)

Heated drying cylinder

Title (de)

Beheizter Trockenzylinder

Title (fr)

Cylindre sécheur chauffé

Publication

EP 1072723 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00111228 A

Priority

DE 19934868 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1072723A2] The cylinder casing (3) is air-permeable over the area of contact of the fibrous web (1) and the interior of the drying cylinder is connected to a source of air pressure. Preferred features: The casing is perforated (9) over the entire area of contact. In this region it is wrapped by an air-permeable cylinder band (6) which is as smooth as possible. This is a fabric band. It is a drying sieve. The air under pressure is preferably heated in the drying cylinder. The cylindrical casing of the cylinder is heated above 200 degrees C, preferably in the range 200 degrees C-400 degrees C. Air pressurization is sufficiently high to form an air cushion (8) between cylinder casing and fibrous web. Cushion thickness is no more than 2 mm, preferably 0.5-1 mm. One or more drying cylinders are employed in the initial region of a drying section of the plant.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 5/02; D21F 5/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/18 (2006.01); F26B 13/10 (2006.01); F26B 13/16 (2006.01); F26B 13/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/182 (2013.01); F26B 13/101 (2013.01); F26B 13/16 (2013.01); F26B 13/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19934868 A1 20010125; EP 1072723 A2 20010131; EP 1072723 A3 20010425; US 6442868 B1 20020903

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040325

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031112

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI SE

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011025

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI