Global patent index - EP 1072728 A2

EP 1072728 A2 2001-01-31 - Dispenser for toilet hygiene liquids

Title (en)

Dispenser for toilet hygiene liquids

Title (de)

Spender für Toiletten-Hygiene-Flüssigkeiten

Title (fr)

Distributeur de liquides hygiéniques pour toilettes

Publication

EP 1072728 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00112351 A

Priority

DE 29912647 U

Abstract (en)

The dispenser has a holder bracket (5) for holding the dispenser over a rim (7) of the toilet. A container (2) holds the fluid (3) and has an outlet opening (12) containing a valve arrangement (16). An activator (20) connected to the valve arrangement is activated by the flush water and opens the valve.

Abstract (de)

Ein Spender für Toiletten-Hygiene-Flüssigkeiten, wie Reinigungsmittel, Desinfektionslösungen oder Duftgele, ist versehen mit einem Haltebügel (5) zum Einhängen des Spenders (1) am Toiletten-Schüsselrand (7), einem Behälter (2) zur Aufnahme der Flüssigkeit (3), der eine Auslauföffnung (12) zur gravitationsbedingten Abgabe der Flüssigkeit (3) aufweist, einer Ventilanordnung (16) an der Auslauföffnung (12), und einem vom Spülwasser (28) beaufschlagbaren Betätigungselement (20) an der Ventilanordnung (16), das bei Beaufschlagung durch Spülwasser (28) die Ventilanordnung (16) öffnet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03D 9/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03D 9/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03D 9/032 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

WO 9801307 A1 19980115 - WEISS OLIVER [DE]

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29912647 U1 19990923; EP 1072728 A2 20010131; EP 1072728 A3 20020918

INPADOC legal status

2003-08-06 [R18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R18D

- Effective date: 20030103

2003-07-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030101

2003-07-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI