Global Patent Index - EP 1072729 A1

EP 1072729 A1 2001-01-31 - Building part as a connecting element between two construction parts

Title (en)

Building part as a connecting element between two construction parts

Title (de)

Bauteil als Verbindungselement zwischen zwei Gebäudeteilen

Title (fr)

Pièce de construction comme élément de connection entre deux parties de bâtiment

Publication

EP 1072729 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00810546 A

Priority

CH 139099 A

Abstract (en)

The structural part (1) connects between two building parts separated from each other by an insulation layer (19) of specific thickness (d). It comprises at least one reinforcement iron forming a loop (2,3) and consisting of a bent area (4) and two parallel running legs (5,6) held together by first and second plates (7,8). The plates are vertical to the legs and arranged in a central area of them. Between the plates an insulation component (14) is inserted, which has a thickness corresponding to that of the insulation layer (d). The area of the at least one loop extending out of the insulation component (14) and over the first plate (7) is enclosed in a first layer (17). The surface of the first plate facing the bent area of the at least one loop is covered with a second layer (18). The first and second layers are of heat and step noise-insulating material.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Bauteil (1) als Verbindungselement zwischen zwei Gebäudeteilen, die durch eine Isolationsschicht (19) voneinander getrennt sind, ist eine erste Schlaufe (2) und eine zweite Schlaufe (3) aus Armierungseisen vorgesehen. Diese erste Schlaufe (2) und die zweite Schlaufe (3) sind durch eine erste Platte (7) und eine zweite Platte (8) zusammengehalten. Zwischen diesen Platten ist ein Isolationselement eingesetzt, das die gleiche Dicke (d) aufweist, wie die Isolationsschicht (19). Der Bereich der ersten Schlaufe (2) und der zweiten Schlaufe (3), der über die erste Platte (7) vorstehend ist, ist mit einer ersten Schicht (17) überzogen, während die Fläche der ersten Platte (7), die dem Bogenbereich (4) der ersten Schlaufe (2) und der zweiten Schlaufe (3) zugewandt ist, mit einer zweiten Schicht (18) abgedeckt ist. Die erste Schicht (17) und die zweite Schicht (18) bestehen aus einem wärmedämmenden und trittschalldämmenden Material, wie beispielsweise Neopren. Damit wird zwischen den zu verbindenden Gebäudeteilen eine Trittschalldämmung und eine optimale Wärmedämmung erreicht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/00 (2006.01); E04B 1/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/0038 (2013.01); E04B 2001/8254 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072729 A1 20010131; EP 1072729 B1 20040609; AT 268843 T 20040615; DE 50006727 D1 20040715; DK 1072729 T3 20041018

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160613

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-03-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: F.J. ASCHWANDEN AG

- Free text: F.J. ASCHWANDEN AG#GRENZSTRASSE 24#3250 LYSS (CH) -TRANSFER TO- F.J. ASCHWANDEN AG#GRENZSTRASSE 24#3250 LYSS (CH)

2009-03-06 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: F.J. ASCHWANDEN A.G.GRENZSTRASSE 24, CH-3250 LYSS

- Effective date: 20081202

2008-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: F.J. ASCHWANDEN A.G.

- Effective date: 20081202

2008-12-03 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2008-11-03 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: F.J. ASCHWANDEN AG

- Effective date: 20080821

2008-11-03 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: HALFEN SWISS AG

2008-08-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: HALFEN SWISS AG

- Free text: NIVO AG#GRENZSTRASSE 24#3250 LYSS (CH) -TRANSFER TO- HALFEN SWISS AG#INDUSTRIESTRASSE 32#8108 DAELLIKON (CH)

2008-08-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: F.J. ASCHWANDEN AG

- Free text: HALFEN SWISS AG#INDUSTRIESTRASSE 32#8108 DAELLIKON (CH) -TRANSFER TO- F.J. ASCHWANDEN AG#GRENZSTRASSE 24#3250 LYSS (CH)

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041109

2005-06-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050310

2005-03-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-01-12 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-10-18 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-09-28 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-09-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-09-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-09-09 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040909

2004-07-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-07-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50006727 P 20040715

2004-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-22 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040622

2004-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2004-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-06-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-06-09 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040609

2004-06-09 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040609

2004-06-09 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040609

2004-06-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040609

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010324

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI