Global Patent Index - EP 1072731 A1

EP 1072731 A1 2001-01-31 - Glazing frame for partition walls

Title (en)

Glazing frame for partition walls

Title (de)

Verglasungsrahmen für Montagewände

Title (fr)

Cadre de vitrage pour cloisons

Publication

EP 1072731 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00113430 A

Priority

DE 29913128 U

Abstract (en)

Two or more holders are arranged vertically above each other in the vertical stands (9) on at least one side of the glass panes (13, 13). At least one glass holder strip in the form of a slotted box profile is elastically engageable with the overlapping holders. The glazing frame (29) is mounted in a wall (1) with at least one vertical stand. Glass panes are held between pairs of holder strips.

Abstract (de)

Ein Verglasungsrahmen (29) für mit mindestens einem vertikalen Ständer (9) versehene Montagewände mit zwei den Randbereich einer Glasscheibe (13, 13') zwischen sich aufnehmenden Glas-Halteleisten (15, 15') weist am Ständer (9) mindestens auf einer Seite der Glasscheibe (13, 13') im vertikalen Abstand übereinander mindestens zwei Halter (14, 14') auf. Weiterhin ist mindestens eine nach Art eines geschlitzte Kastenprofils ausgebildete Glas-Halteleiste (15, 15') vorgesehen, die mit den übereinander angeordneten Haltern (14, 14') elastisch verriegelbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/74; E06B 3/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/74 (2006.01); E06B 1/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/7455 (2013.01); E06B 1/38 (2013.01); E04B 2/7411 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29913128 U1 19990930; AT 287998 T 20050215; EP 1072731 A1 20010131; EP 1072731 B1 20050126

INPADOC legal status


2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120103

2012-04-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50009332

- Effective date: 20120103

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100812

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090624

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070624

2008-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080530

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-01-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051027

2005-07-27 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: R&M AUSBAU GMBH

2005-03-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50009332 P 20050303

2005-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT

2004-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040224

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE IT

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010223

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI