Global Patent Index - EP 1072736 A1

EP 1072736 A1 2001-01-31 - Safety guard

Title (en)

Safety guard

Title (de)

Schutzvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de protection

Publication

EP 1072736 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00306323 A

Priority

GB 9917876 A

Abstract (en)

A safety guard (1) for protecting the edges of a horizontal or flat roof is described. The safety guard (1) combines a mesh (7) to prevent bricks or debris falling over the edge of a roof and a toe board (11) for mounting flush with the roof. The safety guard (1) is provided with hooks (9) for hooking over a substantially horizontal scaffolding pole (29) and the toe board (11) is movable with respect to the hooks (9). In embodiments, the toe board (11) is movable with respect to the mesh (7); alternatively the hooks (9) can be moved with respect to the mesh (7). The toe board (11) and mesh (7) may be integrally formed of plastics, such as rigid polypropylene. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 21/32; E04G 1/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 5/14 (2006.01); E04G 21/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 5/145 (2013.01); E04G 21/3223 (2013.01); E04G 5/14 (2013.01); E04G 21/3214 (2013.01); E04G 2005/148 (2013.01); E04G 2007/285 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

GB 2279392 A 19950104 - ARCHER ANDREW WILLIAM [GB], et al

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072736 A1 20010131; GB 9917876 D0 19990929

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031119

2003-06-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030508

2003-02-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ARCHER, ANDREW WILLIAM

2003-02-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WILLIS, JOHN HOWARD

2003-02-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ARCHER, ANDREW WILLIAM

2003-02-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WILLIS, JOHN HOWARD

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI