Global Patent Index - EP 1072746 A2

EP 1072746 A2 2001-01-31 - Monolithic hinge for dump boxes of trucks, trailers and the like

Title (en)

Monolithic hinge for dump boxes of trucks, trailers and the like

Title (de)

Monolithisches Scharnier für Kippbehälter von Lastkraftwagen, Anhängern oder dgl

Title (fr)

Charnière monolithique pour benne de camion, remorque ou similaire

Publication

EP 1072746 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00114966 A

Priority

IT BO990101 U

Abstract (en)

A monolithic hinge (1) for dump boxes of trucks, trailers and the like, comprising two sections (2,3), the first section (2) being rigidly coupled to one edge of a flap, the second section (3) being rigidly coupled to the side of the corresponding opening of the wall of the dump box, the first and second sections being adapted to rest against each other in the flap closure configuration; the sections comprise respective mirror-symmetrical slots (4,5) having a recess (16) and a plurality of ribs (17) which are adapted to retain the wings (7) of a strip (6) made of flexible material, such as rubber, for the rotation of the flap with respect to the opening of the dump box wall; the strip has a substantially U-shaped cross-section when the flap is closed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 1/02 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/516 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

IT BO990101 U1 20010129 - PASTORE & LOMBARDI SRL [IT]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072746 A2 20010131; EP 1072746 A3 20020109; IT 247488 Y1 20020822; IT BO990101 U1 20010129

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-29 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040802

2002-09-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020610

2002-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI