Global Patent Index - EP 1072747 A2

EP 1072747 A2 2001-01-31 - Actuator for the motorized swinging of a front door or a tailgate of a vehicle

Title (en)

Actuator for the motorized swinging of a front door or a tailgate of a vehicle

Title (de)

Antriebsvorrichtung zum motorischen Schwenken einer Front- oder Heckklappe eines Kraftfahrzeugs

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'entraînement pour le pivotement motorisé d'un panneau frontal ou d'un hayon de véhicule

Publication

EP 1072747 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00113108 A

Priority

DE 19935344 A

Abstract (en)

The drive system is designed so that the drive motor (10) is fitted laterally covered and can be arranged so that it is relatively weak. The motor is designed changeable in length by the power application of a lifting piston integrated in it. The drive motor has one end located with limited swiveling ability at the vehicle bodywork and at the other end engages at a swivel lever (8) connected rotationally proof with the drive shaft (4). The length of the swivel lever is selected to suit the desired swivel torque for the flap e.g. luggage compartment cover or an engine bonnet.

Abstract (de)

Eine Antriebsvorrichtung für eine Front- oder Heckklappe eines Kraftfahrzeugs enthält ein Mehrgelenkscharnier (1) mit einer zugleich eine Antriebswelle (4) bildenden Schwenkachse an einem der Scharnierarme (3) sowie einen Antriebsmotor (10). Damit dieser seitlich abgedeckt untergebracht und relativ schwach ausgelegt werden kann, ist er durch Kraftbeaufschlagung eines in ihn integrierten Hubkolbens längenveränderbar ausgebildet und greift er an einem drehfest auf der Antriebswelle (4) sitzenden Schwenkhebel (8) an, dessen Länge im Hinblick auf das gewünschte Schwenkmoment für die Klappe gewählt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 15/04; E05F 15/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/04 (2006.01); E05F 15/12 (2006.01); E05D 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/63 (2013.01); E05D 3/145 (2013.01); E05F 1/1292 (2013.01); E05F 15/622 (2013.01); E05Y 2400/326 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/458 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/50 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/531 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/536 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/546 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19744908 A1 19990415 - VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072747 A2 20010131; EP 1072747 A3 20011121; DE 19935344 A1 20010201; DE 19935344 B4 20110127

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20150217

2012-07-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOLKSWAGEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-08-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020521

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI