Global Patent Index - EP 1072749 A3

EP 1072749 A3 2001-04-18 - Electromechanical drive for rotary column moving the leaf of a swinging door on a vehicle, especially a mass-transit vehicle.

Title (en)

Electromechanical drive for rotary column moving the leaf of a swinging door on a vehicle, especially a mass-transit vehicle.

Title (de)

Elektromechanischer Antrieb für eine Drehsäule zur Bewegung eines Türflügels einer Innenschwenk- oder Aussenschwingtür an einem Fahrzeug, insbesondere einem öffentlichen Verkehrsmittel

Title (fr)

Actionnement électromécanique pour tourillon pour le movement du battant d'une porte palière d'un vehicule notamment d'un vehicule de transport public.

Publication

EP 1072749 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00111235 A

Priority

DE 19927169 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19927169A1] The operating drive has an electric motor (1) coupled to a pivot column for the vehicle door via an intermediate drive coupling, with an emergency operating device allowing the drive coupling between the motor and the pivot column to be released. The drive coupling uses a cogwheel drive (2) with a drive spline (2.2) engaging a cog segment of the pivot column and a driven cogwheel (2.1) cooperating with a drive spline (1.2) of the electric motor, which is disengaged by a pivot movement of the carrier plate (4) on which the motor is mounted.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 15/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/30 (2006.01); E05F 15/10 (2006.01); E05F 15/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/30 (2013.01); E05F 15/603 (2013.01); E05F 15/614 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/246 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/434 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/448 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/716 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/13 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/32 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/11 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/21 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/22 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/25 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/262 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/00 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/51 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19927169 A1 20001221; AT 283959 T 20041215; EP 1072749 A2 20010131; EP 1072749 A3 20010418; EP 1072749 B1 20041201; ES 2231073 T3 20050516

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130525

2014-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-02-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131201

2014-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130525

2014-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 283959 T

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-12-11 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131201

2013-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: GEBRUDER *BODE G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120521

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120522

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120522

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120608

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120523

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060525

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: GEBRUEDER BODE GMBH & CO.KG

- Free text: GEBRUEDER BODE GMBH & CO.KG#OCHSHAEUSER STRASSE 14#34123 KASSEL (DE) -TRANSFER TO- GEBRUEDER BODE GMBH & CO.KG#OCHSHAEUSER STRASSE 14#34123 KASSEL (DE)

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050501

2007-05-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070523

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050902

2005-11-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-27 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-25 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050525

2005-05-20 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20050520

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2231073 T3

2005-03-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-03-01 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-03-01 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-02-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050127

2005-01-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2005-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008809 P 20050105

2004-12-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-12-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-12-01 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-01 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ALAPONT, SALVADOR

2004-12-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SIEBERT, WOLFGANG

2004-12-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HORN, MANFRED

2004-12-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WEBER, STEFFEN

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI