Global Patent Index - EP 1072750 A1

EP 1072750 A1 2001-01-31 - Sectional door

Title (en)

Sectional door

Title (de)

Sektionaltor

Title (fr)

Porte sectionnelle

Publication

EP 1072750 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99114660 A

Priority

EP 99114660 A

Abstract (en)

The sectional gate (10) has components (12,14) joined to each other by links (16) on their insides and pivotable around a link axis (22). One long edge (30) of each component is formed with a longitudinally extending tongue raised formation (34) and the second long edge (32) of each component is formed with a longitudinally extending groove recess (36). On the first long edge of the tongue raised formation inside and outside a locating shoulder (38) abuts and on the second long edge on the groove recess inside and outside a buttress shoulder (40) abuts, which in the closed state of the gate locates on the corresponding locating shoulder. The link axis is provided in the vicinity of the inside locating shoulder and the inside buttress shoulder.

Abstract (de)

Ein einfacher selbstzentrierender Zusammenbau der Sektionaltorelemente (12,14) ist möglich, wenn am ersten Längsrand (30) an die Federerhebung (34) innenseitig und außenseitig je eine Auflageschulter (38) angrenzt und wenn am zweiten Längsrand (32) an die Nutausnehmung (36) innenseitig und außenseitig je eine Widerlagerschulter (40) angrenzt. Im geschlossenen Zustand des Sektionaltores (10) liegen die Widerlagerschultern (40) auf den Auflageschultern (38) auf. Um innenseitig einen Fingerschutz zu gewährleisten, ist die Gelenkachse (22) in der Nachbarschaft der innnenseitigen Auflageschulter (38) und der innenseitigen Widerlagerschulter (40) vorgesehen. Ein außenseitiger Fingerschutz im aufgeschwenkten Zustand wird durch ein Profilelement (44) erzielt, das von der Federerhebung (34) wegsteht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/485 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4019569 C2 19980430 - GUTTMANN HERBERT [AT]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072750 A1 20010131

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060131

2004-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040206

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE IT

2001-09-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010720

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI