Global Patent Index - EP 1072753 A2

EP 1072753 A2 2001-01-31 - Venetian blind

Title (en)

Venetian blind

Title (de)

Lamellenjalousie

Title (fr)

Store vénitien

Publication

EP 1072753 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00115873 A

Priority

DE 29913131 U

Abstract (en)

The lamella blinds have a guiding track (30) with at least one joint (60) and on raising and lowering of the blinds an end is formed. A control means (54) is situated in the end section (8) and has an operative coupling with a tension unit (40). On activating the drive (22,24) the blind is moved. Translation movement of the tension unit is caused by activating the drive unit.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Lamellenjalousie mit einem Behang aus mehreren horizontalen Lamellen und einem horizontalen Endprofil, mit einem Antrieb, mit flexiblen Zugorganen, die bei Aktivierung des Antriebs den Behang anheben oder absenken, wobei die Lamellen von flexiblen Wendeorganen gehalten um vorgegebene Neigungswinkel um ihre horizontale Achse verschwenkbar sind. Die Erfindung ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß die Zugorgane in seitlichen Führungsschienen (30) angeordnet und um mindestens je ein Umlenkorgan (60) herumgeführt sind und beim Anheben oder Absenken des Behanges (2) gegenläufige Trumms bilden, und daß Steuermittel (54) in dem Endprofil (8) angeordnet sind, die in operativer Kopplung mit dem/den Zugorganen (40) stehen und bei Aktivierung des Antriebs (22, 24) betätigbar sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/30; E06B 9/388

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/307 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/307 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19727380 A1 19990211 - WAREMA RENKHOFF GMBH & CO KG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29913131 U1 20001207; EP 1072753 A2 20010131; EP 1072753 A3 20021218

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-10 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040917

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HUEPPELUX SONNENSCHUTZSYSTEME GMBH & CO. KG

2004-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040316

2003-09-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB LI NL

2003-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030306

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-12-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 06B 9/30 A, 7E 06B 9/388 B, 7E 06B 9/327 B

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI