Global Patent Index - EP 1072753 A3

EP 1072753 A3 2002-12-18 - Venetian blind

Title (en)

Venetian blind

Title (de)

Lamellenjalousie

Title (fr)

Store vénitien

Publication

EP 1072753 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00115873 A

Priority

DE 29913131 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1072753A2] The lamella blinds have a guiding track (30) with at least one joint (60) and on raising and lowering of the blinds an end is formed. A control means (54) is situated in the end section (8) and has an operative coupling with a tension unit (40). On activating the drive (22,24) the blind is moved. Translation movement of the tension unit is caused by activating the drive unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/30; E06B 9/327; E06B 9/388

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/307 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/307 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29913131 U1 20001207; EP 1072753 A2 20010131; EP 1072753 A3 20021218

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-10 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040917

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HUEPPELUX SONNENSCHUTZSYSTEME GMBH & CO. KG

2004-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040316

2003-09-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB LI NL

2003-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030306

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-12-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 06B 9/30 A, 7E 06B 9/388 B, 7E 06B 9/327 B

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI