Global Patent Index - EP 1072778 A2

EP 1072778 A2 2001-01-31 - Method for controlling idling in an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Method for controlling idling in an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Regelung der Leerlaufdrehzahl einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Méthode de régulation de la vitesse de ralenti pour un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1072778 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00830518 A

Priority

IT TO990663 A

Abstract (en)

Method for controlling idling in an internal combustion engine for vehicles, comprising the phases of: supervising at least one operating parameter of the engine, and correcting the quantity of air/fuel delivered to the engine as a function of the variations of the said operating parameter, in order to maintain the revolution speed of the engine essentially equivalent to a pre-established value of reference. The objective of the method is to establish an estimated value of a torque applied to the engine as a function of an angular acceleration value detected during a cycle of the internal combustion engine and to effect a correction of the quantity of air/fuel delivered to the engine as a function of the variations in the said estimated torque value. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/14; F02D 41/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 31/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01); F02D 41/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/16 (2013.01); F02D 31/003 (2013.01); F02D 31/008 (2013.01); F02D 41/1497 (2013.01); F02D 2200/1004 (2013.01); F02D 2200/1012 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072778 A2 20010131; EP 1072778 A3 20020828; EP 1072778 B1 20030924; DE 60005444 D1 20031030; DE 60005444 T2 20040506; ES 2207483 T3 20040601; IT 1310644 B1 20020219; IT TO990663 A1 20010129; IT TO990663 D0 19990728

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160712

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160708

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130721

2014-08-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140807

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130720

2014-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130721

2014-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130720

2014-03-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120824

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120711

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120718

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-05-04 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-09-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040625

2004-06-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2207483 T3

2003-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60005444 P 20031030

2003-10-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-10-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-09-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-04-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030206

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI