Global patent index - EP 1072784 A2

EP 1072784 A2 2001-01-31 - Exhaust gas recirculation valve

Title (en)

Exhaust gas recirculation valve

Title (de)

Steuerventil zur Abgasrückführung

Title (fr)

Valve de recirculation de gaz d'échappement

Publication

EP 1072784 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00115420 A

Priority

DE 19935483 A

Abstract (en)

The control valve is designed so that in the valve body (150) at least one pressure equalizing duct (161) is arranged, which connects the two chambers (168,170) with each other in the valve housing (102). The sides of the two valve elements (154,156) pointing in the two chambers are formed in such a manner so that the pressure forces (Fex1-4) caused by the pressure at the valve elements, which react in the movement direction of the valve body (150), at least are approximately the same value.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Steuerventil zur Abgasrückführung in eine Luftansaug- bzw. Kraftstoffaufbereitungsanlage einer Verbrennungskraftmaschine. Das Steuerventil weist ein Ventilgehäuse auf, in dem ein mit einem Auslaß der Verbrennungskraftmaschine verbindbarer Abgaseinlaß, eine mit der Luftansaug- bzw. Kraftstoffaufbereitungsanlage verbindbare erste Kammer und eine zweite Kammer ausgebildet ist, wobei die erste Kammer und die zweite Kammer jeweils eine in den Abgaseinlaß mündende Öffnung aufweisen. Im Ventilgehäuse ist ein sich durch die Öffnungen erstreckender Ventilkörper verschieblich gelagert, an dem zwei Ventilelemente zum Verschließen der Öffnungen vorgesehen sind. Der Ventilkörper kann zwischen einer Freigabestellung und einer Schließstellung zum Öffnen und Schließen mindestens einer der Öffnungen aktiviert werden. Im Ventilkörper ist mindestens ein Druckausgleichskanal ausgebildet, der die beiden Kammern im Ventilgehäuse miteinander verbindet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 25/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 25/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 26/68 (2016.02); F02M 26/53 (2016.02); F02M 26/67 (2016.02)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072784 A2 20010131; EP 1072784 A3 20011010; EP 1072784 B1 20030409; DE 19935483 A1 20010201

INPADOC legal status

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100802

2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50001684

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110331

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090709

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090710

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-07-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050717

2005-03-09 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040717

2004-07-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040717

2004-03-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040112

2003-11-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-04-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030409

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-04-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2002-05-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020405

2002-04-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011207

2001-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI