Global Patent Index - EP 1072786 A2

EP 1072786 A2 2001-01-31 - Fuel injector

Title (en)

Fuel injector

Title (de)

Kraftstoffeinspritzventil

Title (fr)

Injecteur à combustible

Publication

EP 1072786 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00306425 A

Priority

GB 9917997 A

Abstract (en)

A fuel injector comprising a valve needle (12) biased towards a seating by a first spring (18), the first spring (18) being located within a spring chamber (17) having a closed end. The valve needle (12) is engageable with a moveable stop member (23) which is biased towards a rest position by a second spring (22) located within the spring chamber (17). The fuel injector also includes a spring abutment member (25) for the second spring (22), the spring abutment member (25) being of tubular form and transmitting the spring load of the second spring (22) to the closed end of the spring chamber (17). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 45/08; F02M 61/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 45/08 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01); F02M 61/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 45/083 (2013.01); F02M 61/16 (2013.01); F02M 61/20 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072786 A2 20010131; EP 1072786 A3 20020508; GB 9917997 D0 19990929

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021109

2003-03-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-01-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI