Global Patent Index - EP 1072788 A2

EP 1072788 A2 2001-01-31 - Method of forming a chamber in a workpiece

Title (en)

Method of forming a chamber in a workpiece

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Bilden einer Kammer in einem Werkstück

Title (fr)

Procédé de formation d'une chambre dans une pièce

Publication

EP 1072788 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00306424 A

Priority

  • GB 9917997 A
  • GB 9929605 A

Abstract (en)

A method of forming a chamber (13) in a workpiece (10) comprises the steps of forming a blind bore (12) in the workpiece (10) and inserting an insert member (20) into the blind end of the bore (12) such that the insert member (20) and the bore (12) together define the chamber (13). The invention also relates to a workpiece formed using such a method. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 61/16; F02M 61/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072788 A2 20010131; EP 1072788 A3 20020703

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030104

2003-04-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-03-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-07-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 02M 61/16 A

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI