Global Patent Index - EP 1072796 A2

EP 1072796 A2 2001-01-31 - Process for operating a screw-type compressor

Title (en)

Process for operating a screw-type compressor

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Betreiben eines Schraubenverdichters

Title (fr)

Procédé de commande d'un compresseur à vis

Publication

EP 1072796 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00115787 A

Priority

DE 19935041 A

Abstract (en)

The cylinder chamber(44) of the compressor has a backflow orifice(58) and at least one intermediate backflow orifice(74,76) establishing a minimum position(Mi) and intermediate position(Z1,Z2) respectively. The control unit(66) in the mode for stepless control of the piston positions in a range between the intermediate position and minimum position activates the backflow orifice, and for stepless control of the piston positions outside the range between the intermediate position and minimum position activates the intermediate backflow orifice. An Independent claim is included for a control unit which activates feed flow in an established cycle.

Abstract (de)

Um einen Schraubenverdichter umfassend ein Gehäuse mit einer Läuferkammer, zwei in der Läuferkammer angeordnete Schraubenläufer, einen an die Läuferkammer angrenzenden Schieber zur Leistungssteuerung, eine Stelleinrichtung, umfassend einen Zylinder sowie eine zugeordnete Steuereinrichtung mit welcher in einem stufenlosen Steuermodus ein Zufluß und ein Rückfluß des zum Betätigen des Zylinders vorgesehenen Mediums steuerbar ist, derart zu verbessern daß die Steuereinrichtung zuverlässig arbeitet, wird vorgeschlagen, daß die Zylinderkammer eine Rückflußöffnung und eine Zwischenrückflußöffnung aufweist, und daß die Steuereinrichtung in dem Steuermodus zur stufenlosen Steuerung in einem Teilsteuerbereich zwischen einer Zwischenstellung und einer Minimalstellung die Rückflußöffnung aktiviert und zur stufenlosen Steuerung von Kolbenstellungen außerhalb des Teilsteuerbereichs die die Zwischenstellung festlegende entsprechende Zwischenrückflußöffnung aktiviert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 18/16; F04C 29/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F03C 2/00 (2006.01); F04C 18/16 (2006.01); F04C 28/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 28/125 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072796 A2 20010131; EP 1072796 A3 20020710; EP 1072796 B1 20041013; AT 279652 T 20041015; DE 19935041 A1 20010208; US 6276911 B1 20010821

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170728

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170727

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170720

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160930

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50008197

- Representative's name: HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MB, DE

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050313

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BITZER KUHLMASCHINENBAU G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20050731

2006-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-10-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050714

2005-09-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-07-21 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-07-21 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-05-18 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-03-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050222

2005-01-13 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050113

2005-01-13 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050113

2005-01-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050113

2004-11-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008197 P 20041118

2004-11-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-10-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-10-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041013

2004-10-13 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041013

2004-10-13 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041013

2004-10-13 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041013

2004-03-10 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR OPERATING A SCREW-TYPE COMPRESSOR

2003-04-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021030

2002-10-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020827

2002-07-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI