Global Patent Index - EP 1072800 A2

EP 1072800 A2 2001-01-31 - Suction device and separator using same

Title (en)

Suction device and separator using same

Title (de)

Absaugvorrichtung und diese verwendende Trennvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'aspiration et séparateur utilisant ledit dispositif

Publication

EP 1072800 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00115911 A

Priority

  • JP 21265999 A
  • JP 2000210883 A

Abstract (en)

A suction device utilizing a vortex flow of gas such as compressed air comprises a casing having a conical body formed with a conical inner peripheral surface having a small diameter side end to which a suction port is formed and at least one nozzle member provided for the conical body so as to jet gas inside the conical body along the inner conical surface thereof as a vortex flow of gas. The suction device may further comprise a cover member formed to the conical body so as to cover a large diameter side end of the conical body, the cover member having a side portion to which a discharge port is formed. The suction device is preferably utilized for a separator for selectively separating bags and films from other rubbishes during the conveyance thereof on a conveyer. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04F 5/42; B07B 4/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B07B 4/00 (2006.01); F04F 5/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04F 5/42 (2013.01); B07B 4/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

JP H09966 A 19970107 - KUBOTA KK

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072800 A2 20010131; EP 1072800 A3 20020116; JP 2001096233 A 20010410; JP 3754607 B2 20060315

INPADOC legal status


2007-07-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070201

2002-10-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR IT LI

2002-07-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020521

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI