Global Patent Index - EP 1072846 A2

EP 1072846 A2 2001-01-31 - Ceiling mounted convector

Title (en)

Ceiling mounted convector

Title (de)

Deckenkonvektor

Title (fr)

Convecteur pour plafond

Publication

EP 1072846 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00114735 A

Priority

DE 19934886 A

Abstract (en)

The ceiling convector with conduits through which a heat carrier medium flows has heat-conductively couplable, lamella-shaped heat exchanger components forming a heat exchanger packet. Between two heat exchanger components an air intermediate space for through passage of air is located. The air flows from top to bottom through the heat exchanger packet, being cooled or heated. Between two heat exchanger packets (6) is an inflow area (10), through which room air flows inwards in areas above the heat exchanger packets. Directly laterally next to a heat exchanger packet is an inflow area (11,12). Two heat exchanger packets separated by an inflow area are connected by at least one rigid conduit (8), which extends through an inflow area and penetrates the plate-shaped heat exchanger components (7).

Abstract (de)

Ein Deckenkonvektor (1) weist Leitungen (8) auf, die von einem Wärmeträgermedium durchströmbar sind, sowie damit wärmeleitend koppelbare, lamellenförmige Wärmetauscherelemente (7), die in paralleler Anordnung zueinander mindestens ein Wärmetauscherpaket (6) bilden. Zwischen jeweils zwei Wärmetauscherelementen (7) befindet sich ein Luftzwischenraum zum Durchtritt von Luft, die das Wärmetauscherpaket (6) von oben nach unten durchströmt und dabei abkühlbar oder erwärmbar ist. Um einen einfach herstellbaren Deckenkonvektor (1) ohne Nachströmflächen in Form von Schattenfugen zu schaffen, wird vorgeschlagen, daß sich zwischen zwei Wärmetauscherpaketen (6) ein Zuströmbereich (10) befindet, durch den Raumluft in Bereiche oberhalb der Wärmetauscherpakete (6) einströmt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/00 (2011.01); F24F 1/01 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/0007 (2013.01); F24F 1/01 (2013.01); F24F 2001/0037 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072846 A2 20010131; EP 1072846 A3 20020417; DE 19934886 C1 20010301

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021018

2003-02-13 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-01-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI