Global Patent Index - EP 1072857 A1

EP 1072857 A1 2001-01-31 - Guidance system for the recoiling mass of an artillery gun

Title (en)

Guidance system for the recoiling mass of an artillery gun

Title (de)

Führungssystem für rücklaufende Masse eines Geschützes

Title (fr)

Système de guidage pour la masse reculante d'une artillerie

Publication

EP 1072857 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401873 A

Priority

FR 9909665 A

Abstract (en)

The guide system, comprising a slider (15) and lateral slideways (10) with bronze shoes (22), has a rail (17) with a groove (19) fitted to each side of the slider. The groove in each rail is shaped to receive a shoe (22) and prevent its extraction, with the shoe itself fixed to a slideway via a support (23). The groove and shoe have matching V-shaped surfaces, and the clearance (d) between the shoe and slideway is adjustable.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un système de guidage de la masse reculante d'une artillerie par rapport à son berceau, la masse reculante étant équipée d'un traîneau 15 coulissant par rapport à des patins 22 fixés à deux glissières latérales 10. Le traîneau 15 est muni d'un rail 17 incorporant une rainure 19, dans laquelle est disposé le patin coulissant 22, la rainure 19 ayant un profil interdisant l'extraction du patin hors de celle-ci, chaque patin étant lui-même solidaire d'un support 23 fixé à chaque glissière 10. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 25/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 25/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 25/22 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FI GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072857 A1 20010131; EP 1072857 B1 20020821; DE 60000344 D1 20020926; DE 60000344 T2 20021205; ES 2181632 T3 20030301; FR 2797040 A1 20010202; FR 2797040 B1 20010914; US 6347568 B1 20020219

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170703

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170526

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170526

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-21 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: NEXTER SYTEMS

- Effective date: 20160315

2009-07-22 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090625 AND 20090701

2005-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2003-08-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030522

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2181632 T3

2002-09-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60000344 20020926

2002-09-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020821

2002-08-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FI GB LI SE

2002-08-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010913

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FI GB LI SE

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010221

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FI GB LI SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI