Global patent index - EP 1072947 A1

EP 1072947 A1 2001-01-31 - Photographic printer and film scanner

Title (en)

Photographic printer and film scanner

Title (de)

Photographischer Printer und Abtastgerät

Title (fr)

Imprimante photographique et balayeur

Publication

EP 1072947 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00120312 A

Priority

  • EP 95107724 A
  • JP 15763294 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a photographic printer for printing a frame recorded on a photographic film or a film scanner for scanning a frame recorded on a photographic film, comprising a film carrier in which a frame of a photographic film is set, a light source for illuminating said frame of said photographic film set in said film carrier, said light source including diode elements disposed in a matrix for emitting light of red, green and blue colors, said light source illuminating said frame from behind, and an image sensor, constituted by plural cells, for measuring said frame illuminated by said light source photometrically at minute regions of said frame, wherein said diode elements are arranged like a grating, and means are provided for performing three-color sequential photometry or pick-up for said frame recorded on said photographic film. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03B 27/72; G03B 27/73

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03B 27/32 (2006.01); G03B 27/46 (2006.01); G03B 27/54 (2006.01); G03B 27/72 (2006.01); G03B 27/73 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03B 27/735 (2013.01); G03B 27/547 (2013.01); G03B 27/72 (2013.01); G03B 27/725 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0691568 A1 19960110; DE 69534344 D1 20050901; DE 69534344 T2 20060112; DE 69535790 D1 20080904; EP 1072947 A1 20010131; EP 1072947 B1 20080723; EP 1074884 A1 20010207; EP 1074884 B1 20050727; JP H0822081 A 19960123; US 5663782 A 19970902

INPADOC legal status

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110519

2012-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110519

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110131

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100329

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090428

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090506

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-07-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20090424

2008-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69535790

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2008-09-04

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2008-07-23 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 0691568

- Country of Ref Document: EP

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2008-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-07-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2007-03-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FUJIFILM CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-04-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020307

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000915

2001-01-31 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 691568

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB