Global Patent Index - EP 1073018 A1

EP 1073018 A1 2001-01-31 - Pre-payment and post-payment franking machine

Title (en)

Pre-payment and post-payment franking machine

Title (de)

Frankier- und Freimachungsmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine d'affranchissement à pré-paiement et post-paiement

Publication

EP 1073018 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00115844 A

Priority

DE 29913639 U

Abstract (en)

The postal franking machine is based around a microprocessor (46) that is coupled to a keyboard (45), memory and interface elements (41-55). A printer module is also connected to the system. The keyboard facility is used to access the system and to allow a cost calculation mode to be called with values displayed for use for franking. The machine is controlled by a microprocessor programmed for different types of cost calculation e.g. cost calculation before franking, recording of use of machine, no cost calculation with recording of use of machine for data collection. User interface provides input of type of cost calculation from chip card. Keyboard is used to change from one calculation mode to other.

Abstract (de)

Eine Frankier- und Freimachungsmaschine, mit einem Mikroprozessor (46), welcher mit einer Anzeigeeinheit (43) und einer Tastatur (45), Speicher- und Interfacebauelementen verbunden ist, und einen Druckermodul digital ansteuert, hat Eingabe-Mittel (5.2, 10, 45, 88) die zur Eingabe des Abrechnungsmodus ausgebildet sind. Der Mikroprozessor (46) ist programmiert, bei Betätigung bzw. Auslösung der vorgenannten Eingabe-Mittel den Abrechnungsmodus zu wechseln. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00314 (2013.01); G07B 17/00193 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00177 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00241 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00258 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00322 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29913639 U1 20000113; EP 1073018 A1 20010131; US 6853990 B1 20050208

INPADOC legal status


2007-07-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070201

2007-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061222

2003-08-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THIEL, WOLFGANG, DR.

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: THIEL, WOLFGANG, DR.

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010514

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI