Global Patent Index - EP 1073026 A1

EP 1073026 A1 2001-01-31 - A device and method for detecting introduction of foreign bodies into environments of varying conformation

Title (en)

A device and method for detecting introduction of foreign bodies into environments of varying conformation

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Erkennung von Fremdkörpern in Räumen verschiedener Gestalten

Title (fr)

Dispositif et méthode pour détecter l'introduction des corps étrangers dans des espaces de conformations différentes

Publication

EP 1073026 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99114806 A

Priority

EP 99114806 A

Abstract (en)

it is provided a device for detecting introduction of foreign bodies into environments (9) of varying conformation, in particular automatic banknote dispensers (2), comprising a plurality of signal emitters (11) and a plurality of signal sensors (12), in particular infrared radiations, all disposed substantially randomly in the environment (9) to be checked, activating elements (16) capable of sequentially activating the emitters (11), a memory (18) for a data base including the sensor (12) responses on sequential activation of the emitters (11), and comparator circuits (19) adapted to detect variations in said responses relative to the data base. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 13/187; G07D 11/00; G07F 7/10; G07F 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 11/00 (2006.01); G07F 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 19/20 (2013.01); G07D 11/0042 (2013.01); G07D 11/0063 (2013.01); G07F 19/201 (2013.01); G07F 19/205 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1073026 A1 20010131

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050319

2004-12-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 08B 13/187 A

2004-12-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 07F 7/10 B

2004-12-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 07D 11/00 B

2004-12-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 07F 19/00 B

2004-12-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: A DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETECTING INTRODUCTION OF FOREIGN BODIES INTO ENVIRONMENTS OF VARYING CONFORMATION

2003-04-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: M.I.B. S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-01-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021203

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB LI NL

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000524

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB LI NL

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI