Global Patent Index - EP 1073036 A2

EP 1073036 A2 2001-01-31 - Parsing of downloaded documents for a speech synthesis enabled browser

Title (en)

Parsing of downloaded documents for a speech synthesis enabled browser

Title (de)

Analyse von heruntergeladenen Dokumenten für einen Browser mit Sprachsynthese-Fähigkeit

Title (fr)

Analyse de documents téléchargés pour un navigateur équipé d'un dispositif de synthèse de la parole

Publication

EP 1073036 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00306355 A

Priority

JP 21721999 A

Abstract (en)

A browser is provided which is operable to download web pages from a remote server and which is operable to process the received web pages to identify whether or not it includes a command identifying that a speech data file exists for the retrieved web page. If such a command is present, the browser retrieves the appropriate data file and uses it to synthesize speech associated with the current web page being viewed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10L 13/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 13/08 (2006.01); G06F 3/16 (2006.01); G10L 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 13/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1073036 A2 20010131; EP 1073036 A3 20031217; EP 1073036 B1 20051214; DE 60024727 D1 20060119; DE 60024727 T2 20060720; JP 2001043064 A 20010216

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140726

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-05-07 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60024727

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150331

2015-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140726

2015-02-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60024727

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130712

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130726

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130731

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-11-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060915

2006-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-01-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60024727 P 20060119

2005-12-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-12-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-09-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-07-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040510

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-12-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI