Global Patent Index - EP 1073056 A2

EP 1073056 A2 2001-01-31 - Apparatus and method for sampling and storing audio information and apparatus for outputting audio information

Title (en)

Apparatus and method for sampling and storing audio information and apparatus for outputting audio information

Title (de)

Gerät und Verfahren zur Abtastung und Speicherung von Audioinformationen und Gerät zur Ausgabe von Audioinformationen

Title (fr)

Appareil et méthode d'échantillonnage et de stockage d'informations audio et appareil de sortie d'informations audio

Publication

EP 1073056 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00115043 A

Priority

JP 21127799 A

Abstract (en)

An apparatus for sampling partial audio information from audio information and storing it in a memory device (14) provided with: a sampling device (13) for sampling the partial audio information from the audio information in the sampling time which is a integral multiple of a time interval between each beat and the next in the audio information, and a storing device (13) for storing the sampled partial audio information in a memory device (14). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11B 27/00; G10H 1/00; G10H 7/00; G10H 7/02; G11B 20/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10K 15/04 (2006.01); G10H 1/40 (2006.01); G11B 20/10 (2006.01); G11B 27/00 (2006.01); H04H 60/04 (2008.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 60/04 (2013.01); G10H 1/40 (2013.01); G11B 20/10527 (2013.01); G11B 27/002 (2013.01); G10H 2210/391 (2013.01); G10H 2220/086 (2013.01); G10H 2250/641 (2013.01); G11B 2220/2562 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1073056 A2 20010131; EP 1073056 A3 20040128; JP 2001042877 A 20010216; JP 4060993 B2 20080312; US 2003205123 A1 20031106; US 6630621 B1 20031007; US 6734351 B2 20040511

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-05 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20070605

2004-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041111

2004-10-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-03-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040112

2004-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 11B 27/00 A

2004-01-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 10H 1/00 B

2004-01-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 11B 20/10 B

2004-01-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 10H 7/02 B

2004-01-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 10H 7/00 B

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI