Global Patent Index - EP 1073066 A1

EP 1073066 A1 2001-01-31 - Multiconductor cable and method for its production

Title (en)

Multiconductor cable and method for its production

Title (de)

Mehradrige Kabel und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung

Title (fr)

Cable multi-conducteurs et procédé de fabrication d'un tel cable

Publication

EP 1073066 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00402095 A

Priority

FR 9909680 A

Abstract (en)

Electrical multi-conductive cable comprises a bundle of conductors twisted into an assembly and with individual insulation of a crosslinked olefin copolymer grafted with silane and a protective sheath comprising an internal sheath of flexible synthetic material within an external sheath of heavily crosslinked elastomer.

Abstract (fr)

Le câble électrique souple multi-conducteurs a un faisceau de plusieurs conducteurs munis chacun d'une isolation individuelle, en polymère réticulé de type (co)polymère d'oléfine modifié par greffage de silane et une gaine interne en matériau synthétique souple. La gaine interne est recouverte d'une gaine externe en élastomère fortement réticulé.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 3/44; H01B 7/29; H01B 13/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 3/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 3/441 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1073066 A1 20010131; EP 1073066 B1 20040428; DE 60010184 D1 20040603; DE 60010184 T2 20050421; ES 2219279 T3 20041201; FR 2797087 A1 20010202; FR 2797087 B1 20030425

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090721

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090722

2010-09-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090722

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090721

2010-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090721

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080701

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080730

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080829

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080627

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-07-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2007-03-07 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-04-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2219279 T3

2004-08-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040722

2004-06-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60010184 P 20040603

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2004-04-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021212

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010124

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI